This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 04:01:44 (UTC).

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST VS ROSEMARY MORRISON

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSEMARY MORRISON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST

Defendant

ROSEMARY MORRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/10/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/10/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ROSEMARY MORRISON -PLAINTIFF

2/10/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ROSEMARY MORRISON -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4331082

2/10/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4331082

SUMMONS ISSUED ROSEMARY MORRISON

2/10/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ROSEMARY MORRISON

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ROSEMARY MORRISON

3/20/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ROSEMARY MORRISON

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2023; > CANCEL REASON - UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2023; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/23/2023 1:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ROSEMARY MORRISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED ROSEMARY MORRISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/23/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4331082

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ROSEMARY MORRISON -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less