This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/19/2023 at 08:20:21 (UTC).

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST VS JAKARI J JONES

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAKARI J JONES. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST

1515 South Federal Highway Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant

JAKARI J JONES

Jacksonville, FL 32226-5895

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lambert, Vanessa

1515 S Federal Hwy Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432-7404

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/12/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/12/2023- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JAKARI J JONES -PLAINTIFF

1/12/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JAKARI J JONES -PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/12/2023- D5- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312185

1/13/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312185

SUMMONS ISSUED JAKARI J JONES

1/13/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED JAKARI J JONES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JAKARI J JONES

2/16/2023- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JAKARI J JONES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; > CANCEL REASON - PLAINTIFF UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 2/23/2023 1:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JAKARI J JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED JAKARI J JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/23/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312185

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JAKARI J JONES -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less