This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2022 at 17:21:53 (UTC).

WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC VS MARK HEALY

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARK HEALY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FELTEL JR, GILBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FELTEL JR, GILBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC

9310 Old Kings Road South, Suite 1103

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Defendant

MARK HEALY

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33315

Not Classified By Court

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Stefan Beuge, Esq., 101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

100 N Tampa Street, Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY

100 N Tampa Street, Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

100 N. Tampa Street, Ste. 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

JEA

21 West Church Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

3Rd Party Defendant

RANDALL ENVIRONMENTAL INC

1540 International Parkway Suite 2000

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brown, Jacob Aaron

300 N Hogan St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4204

Otero, David Evan

50 N Laura St Ste 3100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3659

Paysinger, Kevin Brian

1710 Shadowood Ln Ste 210

Jacksonville, FL 32207-2184

Other Attorneys

Beuge, Stefan

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602-5150

Diehl, Nathan Franklin

100 N Tampa St Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602-5835

Malans, Ashley Lauren

1540 International Pkwy Ste 2000

Lake Mary, FL 32746-5096

Saavedra, Carolina

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33602-5300

Mills, Eules A Jr

2509 W Gardner Ct

Tampa, FL 33611-4774

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING THE ATTCHED INTERIM REPORT - DEFT

4/11/2022- D42- NOTICE OF FILING THE ATTCHED INTERIM REPORT - DEFT

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -DEFT

3/22/2022- D41- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -DEFT

ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EULES MILLS JR. FOR FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

3/17/2022- D40- ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EULES MILLS JR. FOR FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

NOTICE OF SALE OF ASSETS OF THE ESTATE BY PUBLIC AUCTION SALE

3/14/2022- D39- NOTICE OF SALE OF ASSETS OF THE ESTATE BY PUBLIC AUCTION SALE

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (UNOPPOSED)

3/10/2022- D38- MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (UNOPPOSED)

ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EULES MILLS JR. FOR AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY AND UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY

2/28/2022- D37- ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EULES MILLS JR. FOR AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY AND UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL DAVID OTERO FOR WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC

2/23/2022- D36- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL DAVID OTERO FOR WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CAROLINA SAAVEDRA FOR FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

2/21/2022- D35- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CAROLINA SAAVEDRA FOR FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CAROLINA SAAVEDRA FOR AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

2/21/2022- D34- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CAROLINA SAAVEDRA FOR AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (UNOPPOSED)

2/10/2022- D33- MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (UNOPPOSED)

PROOF OF CLAIM -ASSIGNEE'S

1/31/2022- D32- PROOF OF CLAIM -ASSIGNEE'S

PROOF OF CLAIM -ASSIGNEE

1/28/2022- D31- PROOF OF CLAIM -ASSIGNEE

PROOF OF CLAIM -ASSIGNEE

1/27/2022- D30- PROOF OF CLAIM -ASSIGNEE

PROOF OF CLAIM - ASSIGNEE

1/27/2022- D29- PROOF OF CLAIM - ASSIGNEE

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -ASSIGNEE

1/14/2022- D28- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -ASSIGNEE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TURNOVER OF PROPERTY OF THE ESTATE

1/13/2022- D27- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TURNOVER OF PROPERTY OF THE ESTATE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 12, 2022 @ 09:30 A.M. BEFORE HONORABLE G.L. FELTEL, JR. VIA ZOOM

1/5/2022- D26- NOTICE OF HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 12, 2022 @ 09:30 A.M. BEFORE HONORABLE G.L. FELTEL, JR. VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF LEGAL ADVERTISING

11/17/2021- D25- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF LEGAL ADVERTISING

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2022; NOTICE OF FILING THE ATTCHED INTERIM REPORT - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2022; NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2022; ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EULES MILLS JR. FOR FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; NOTICE OF SALE OF ASSETS OF THE ESTATE BY PUBLIC AUCTION SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2022; MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (UNOPPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/1/2022; ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EULES MILLS JR. FOR AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY AND UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL DAVID OTERO FOR WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CAROLINA SAAVEDRA FOR FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CAROLINA SAAVEDRA FOR AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2022; MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (UNOPPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING : OCT. 26, 2021 @ 4:15 PM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; NOTICE (ASSIGNEE'S) OF EXAMINATION OF ASSIGNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; MOTION TO SET AMOUNT OF ASSIGNEE'S BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; MOTION (ASSIGNEE'S) FOR AUTHORITY TO RETAIN PROFESSIONALS AS OF SEPTEMBER 23, 2021 AND APPROVING ASSIGNEE COMPENSATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION COMMENCING ASSIGNMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3998806

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WPC INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JEA is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant