This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/10/2022 at 06:16:50 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF DISCOVERY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST VS CHRISTINA DANIELS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF DISCOVERY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHRISTINA DANIELS. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE OF DISCOVERY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST

2807 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendants

CHRISTINA DANIELS

Jacksonville, FL 32116

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTINA DANIELS

Jacksonville, FL 32116

JOHN DANIELS

Jacksonville, FL 32116

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN DANIELS

Jacksonville, FL 32116

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Jacksonville, FL 32116

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Jacksonville, FL 32116

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR DUVAL COUNTY

501 W. Adams Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

STATE OF FLORIDA

400 West Bay Street, Suite 1015

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vamvas, Anthony Demetrius IV

2807 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32804-4411

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/2/2022- D5- COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFTS WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

10/4/2022- D22- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFTS WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 01/05/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510;

10/4/2022- D21- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 01/05/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510;

NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT ORDER AND MEMO

9/23/2022- D19- NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT ORDER AND MEMO

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/04/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

8/3/2022- D17- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/04/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,133.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4206499

8/2/2022- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $1,133.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4206499

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE OF FLORIDA

8/2/2022- D14- SUMMONS ISSUED STATE OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR DUVAL COUNTY FLORIDA

8/2/2022- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR DUVAL COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

8/2/2022- D12- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

8/2/2022- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN DANIELS

8/2/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN DANIELS

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN DANIELS

8/2/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN DANIELS

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTINA DANIELS

8/2/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTINA DANIELS

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA DANIELS

8/2/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA DANIELS

CERTIFICATE

8/2/2022- D6- CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20386 PAGE 852-853

8/2/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20386 PAGE 852-853

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

8/2/2022- D3- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

COVER SHEET

8/2/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFTS WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2022; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 01/05/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2022; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/05/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 PER COURT CALENDAR FROM 10/4/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/23/2022; NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT ORDER AND MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/FORECLOSURE >50-<250K 5/25/2021; Assessed : $1,046.00; Paid : $1,046.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTINA DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20386 PAGE 852-853

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less