This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/22/2023 at 11:19:57 (UTC).

WILL RICHARD NAFIE, WILLIAM RICHARD NAFIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 WILL RICHARD NAFIE, WILLIAM RICHARD NAFIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY, THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAM RICHARD NAFIE

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034

Decedent

WILL RICHARD NAFIE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Martin, Joshua Kenneth

960185 Gateway Blvd Ste 201

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034-7843

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $236.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4227684

8/31/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $236.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4227684

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

8/31/2022- D3- PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

8/31/2022- D5- CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/31/2022; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: MARTIN, JOSHUA KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/31/2022; PETITIONER: NAFIE, WILLIAM RICHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/31/2022; ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD BOOK 20482 PAGE 436-437

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/31/2022; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20482 PAGE 438-438

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: PB/Formal Admin/Conservatorship 09/04/2018; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $236.00; Balance: $165.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $236.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4227684

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2022; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2022; PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2022; PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2022; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2022; FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less