This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/20/2023 at 13:45:41 (UTC).

WENDY BATTINELLI VS ROBERT R BATTINELLI III

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 WENDY BATTINELLI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERT R BATTINELLI III. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HORKAN, MAUREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HORKAN, MAUREEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WENDY BATTINELLI

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Respondent

ROBERT R BATTINELLI III

Jacksonville, FL 32258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Zima, Rebecca Nikirk

1835 Eastwest Pkwy Ste 1

Fleming Island, FL 32003-5310

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4256662

10/12/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4256662

COMPLAINT/PETITION PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTRNY

10/12/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTRNY

MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS & FACULTIES

10/12/2022- D4- MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS & FACULTIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REBECCA ZIMA FOR WENDY BATTINELLI

10/14/2022- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REBECCA ZIMA FOR WENDY BATTINELLI

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4258791

10/14/2022- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4258791

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERT R. BATTINELLI III ON 11/1/2022 @ 10:00AM

11/1/2022- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERT R. BATTINELLI III ON 11/1/2022 @ 10:00AM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTY

11/21/2022- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/5/2022; ORDER OF DISMISSAL (FINAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: ZIMA, REBECCA NIKIRK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERT R. BATTINELLI III ON 11/1/2022 @ 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2022; REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE W/ MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285/WENDY BATTINELLI/ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2022; ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER (SPECIAL) / JOHN HOUSEHOLDER, APRIL MOSCO, JAMIE WOOSTER OR OTHER REPRESENTATIVE OF PROCESS SERVER ENTERPRISES, LLC IS APPOINTED TO SERVE PROCESS IN THIS ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBERT R. BATTINELLI, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4258791

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; NOTICE OF FILING - STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (SPECIAL) - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTRNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REBECCA ZIMA FOR WENDY BATTINELLI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed: $409.00; Paid: $409.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4256662

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS & FACULTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN - WENDY BATTINELLI / ATTRNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less