This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/19/2023 at 07:18:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC VS FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

2001 Nw 64Th Street, Suite 130

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASIGNEES LIENORS

Unknown, FL 00000

JAMES BREWTON SHANNON

Jacksonville, FL 32210

JOHN J STONER

Jacksonville, FL 32223

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER

Jacksonville, FL 32223

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

1200 South Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

York, Julie

4919 Memorial Hwy Ste 135

Tampa, FL 33634-7510

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

3/10/2023- D44- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON, FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER NKA CAROLYN STONER

3/10/2023- D47- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON, FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER NKA CAROLYN STONER

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS OF JAMES BREWTON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON

3/9/2023- D45- AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS OF JAMES BREWTON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON, FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER NKA CAROLYN STONER OTHER

3/7/2023- D46- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON, FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER NKA CAROLYN STONER OTHER

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JOHN J. STONER

3/6/2023- D43- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JOHN J. STONER

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY/GRDN/ADM AD LITEM (PLTF'S)

3/6/2023- D42- MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY/GRDN/ADM AD LITEM (PLTF'S)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER

2/16/2023- D41- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER

NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MARCH 28, 2023 @ 9:00 AM RM 510 VIA ZOOM

2/9/2023- D40- NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MARCH 28, 2023 @ 9:00 AM RM 510 VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

2/9/2023- D39- NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

2/9/2023- D38- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 3/28 @ 9:00 AM IN ROOM 510 REMARKS: SVC PENDING PUBLICATION COMING

2/1/2023- D37- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 3/28 @ 9:00 AM IN ROOM 510 REMARKS: SVC PENDING PUBLICATION COMING

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4320921

1/26/2023- D35- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4320921

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. STONER (ALIAS)

1/26/2023- D34- SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. STONER (ALIAS)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION N.O.A. CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICES

1/25/2023- D33- PROOF OF PUBLICATION N.O.A. CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICES

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ON DEFT JOHN J STONER

1/18/2023- D30- SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ON DEFT JOHN J STONER

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. STONER

1/16/2023- D32- SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J. STONER

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B. SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON

1/13/2023- D31- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B. SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ON THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF ELZORA M. SHANNON A/K/A ELZORA BROWN AFK/A M. SHA

1/10/2023- D29- NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ON THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF ELZORA M. SHANNON A/K/A ELZORA BROWN AFK/A M. SHANNON A/K/A ELZORA MAE BROWN, DECEASED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2023; NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON, FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER NKA CAROLYN STONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2023; AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS OF JAMES BREWTON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON, FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER NKA CAROLYN STONER OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JOHN J. STONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY/GRDN/ADM AD LITEM (PLTF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MARCH 28, 2023 @ 9:00 AM RM 510 VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TU UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN J STONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN J STONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMES BREWTON SHANNON AKA JAMES B SHANNON AKA JAMES SHANNON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20508 PAGE 391-392

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/28/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less