This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/01/2022 at 22:19:51 (UTC).

WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION INC VS CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

8777 San Jose Boulevard,, Building A, Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Defendants

STACEY L WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STACEY L WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Jacksonville, FL 32244

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Jacksonville, FL 32244

CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC

C/O Property Management Systems Inc, 463499 State Road 200

Yulee, FL 32097

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sordian, Emily McRee

Suite 200, Bldg A, 8777 San Jose Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32217-4213

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/21/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

6/21/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

6/21/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

6/21/2022- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO STACEY L WILLIAMS

6/21/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO STACEY L WILLIAMS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STACEY L WILLIAMS

6/21/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STACEY L WILLIAMS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

6/21/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

6/21/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

6/21/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

7/13/2022- D12- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

7/15/2022- D13- ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed : $440.00; Paid : $440.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $490.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4178011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STACEY L WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO STACEY L WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20334 PAGE 1499-1499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATERMILL MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CORNERSTONE AT WATERMILL HOMEOWNERS ASSOC., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE