This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 19:24:10 (UTC).

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION VS TATIANA Y SALEH

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 VYSTAR CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TATIANA Y SALEH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION

C/O Hiday & Ricke P.A., Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

Defendant

TATIANA Y SALEH

Gainesville, FL 32603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reiss, Jennifer L

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0858

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/9/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/9/2023- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT -PLAINTIFF

1/9/2023- D4- EXHIBIT -PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS HIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S -PLAINTIFF

1/9/2023- D5- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS HIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309431

1/9/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309431

SUMMONS ISSUED TATIANA Y SALEH -PLAINTIFF

1/9/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TATIANA Y SALEH -PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION REDUCED - BOTH PARTIES

1/20/2023- D8- STIPULATION REDUCED - BOTH PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2023; STIPULATION REDUCED - BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TATIANA Y SALEH -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309431

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS HIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; EXHIBIT -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less