This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 06:13:31 (UTC).

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION VS SHANE PARENTE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 VYSTAR CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANE PARENTE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0850

Defendant

SHANE PARENTE

Jacksonville, FL 32216-3111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reiss, Jennifer L

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0858

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/10/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/10/2023- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SHANE PARENTE -PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SHANE PARENTE -PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS HIDAY & RICKE, P.A'S -PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D5- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS HIDAY & RICKE, P.A'S -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4310586

1/11/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4310586

SUMMONS ISSUED SHANE PARENTE

1/11/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED SHANE PARENTE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 1-13-23 @ 04:30PM FOR SHANE PARENTE, PERSONAL

1/13/2023- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 1-13-23 @ 04:30PM FOR SHANE PARENTE, PERSONAL

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT ADMIT

2/23/2023- D10- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT ADMIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT ADMIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 1-13-23 @ 04:30PM FOR SHANE PARENTE, PERSONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED SHANE PARENTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/23/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4310586

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS HIDAY & RICKE, P.A'S -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SHANE PARENTE -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less