This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/19/2022 at 19:18:23 (UTC).

VILLAS AT CROSS CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS JAYNE A RUDY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 VILLAS AT CROSS CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAYNE A RUDY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAS AT CROSS CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8777 San Jose Boulevard,, Building A, Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Defendants

WILLIAM W RUDY JR

Jacksonville, FL 32225

JAYNE A RUDY

Jacksonville, FL 32225

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Jacksonville, FL 32225

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sordian, Emily McRee

Suite 200, Bldg A, 8777 San Jose Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32217-4213

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/21/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

6/21/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20333 PAGE 1404-1404

6/21/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20333 PAGE 1404-1404

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR VILLAS AT CROSS CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

6/21/2022- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR VILLAS AT CROSS CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED WILLIAM W. RUDY, JR

6/21/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED WILLIAM W. RUDY, JR

SUMMONS ISSUED JAYNE A. RUDY

6/21/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JAYNE A. RUDY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

6/21/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

6/21/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

CASE FEES PAID: $480.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4177634

6/21/2022- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $480.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4177634

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed : $440.00; Paid : $440.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $480.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4177634

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED JAYNE A. RUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED WILLIAM W. RUDY, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL EMILY SORDIAN FOR VILLAS AT CROSS CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20333 PAGE 1404-1404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE