This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/08/2022 at 11:11:32 (UTC).

VILLA MEDICI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. VS ELIZABETH F MCKINNON Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 VILLA MEDICI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ELIZABETH F MCKINNON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLA MEDICI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

5422 First Coast Highway, Suite 125

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034

Defendants

ELIZABETH F MCKINNON

Jacksonville, FL 32205

UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #1

Jacksonville, FL 32216

UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #2

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Joshua Kenneth

960185 Gateway Blvd Ste 201

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034-7843

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/9/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19914 PAGE 566-567

9/9/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19914 PAGE 566-567

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELIZABETH F.MCKINNON AS TRUSTEE OF THE ELIZABETH F. MCKINNON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 22,2018

9/9/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELIZABETH F.MCKINNON AS TRUSTEE OF THE ELIZABETH F. MCKINNON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 22,2018

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #1

9/9/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #2

9/9/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #2

CASE FEES PAID: $470.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725

9/9/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $470.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISSOLUTON OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20086 PAGE 990-991

12/29/2021- D9- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISSOLUTON OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20086 PAGE 990-991

RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO EAVENSON, FRASER & LUNSFORD, PLLC

3/1/2022- D11- RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO EAVENSON, FRASER & LUNSFORD, PLLC

CASE FEES PAID: $330.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725

3/1/2022- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $330.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/1/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $330.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/1/2022; RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO EAVENSON, FRASER & LUNSFORD, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/1/2022; RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725 REVISED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2021; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISSOLUTON OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20086 PAGE 990-991

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE 5/25/2021; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $470.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3982725

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT AND/OR OCCUPANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELIZABETH F.MCKINNON AS TRUSTEE OF THE ELIZABETH F. MCKINNON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 22,2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19914 PAGE 566-567

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; MORTGAGE/LIEN FORECLOSURE - UP TO $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less