This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/26/2022 at 02:09:13 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION, A PUBLIC CORP Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION, A PUBLIC CORP. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Po Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendants

IVORY J KENNEDY

Jacksonville, FL 32211

IDAIRA CINTRON-ORTIZ

Jacksonville, FL 32211

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION, A PUBLIC CORP

227 North Bronough Street, Suite 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY

400 North Tampa Street - Suite 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

QUALITY DISCOUNT ROOFING LLC

8920 Cr 16A

St Augustine, FL 32092

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Jacksonville, FL 32211

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Jacksonville, FL 32211

UNKNOWN TENANT 3

Jacksonville, FL 32211

UNKNOWN TENANT 4

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pasqualone, Joshua David

Attorney at Albertelli Law

208 N Laura St Fl 900

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3510

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 12/06/22 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510

9/21/2022- D24- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 12/06/22 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

8/28/2022- D22- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING VIRTUAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 20, 2022

8/16/2022- D21- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING VIRTUAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 20, 2022

ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE COMPLAINT

8/15/2022- D20- ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE COMPLAINT

ANSWER CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

8/10/2022- D19- ANSWER CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/20/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

7/20/2022- D17- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/20/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,146.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4197087

7/19/2022- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $1,146.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4197087

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 4

7/19/2022- D14- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 4

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 3

7/19/2022- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 3

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

7/19/2022- D12- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

7/19/2022- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IVORY J KENNEDY AKA IVORY J KENNEDY SR AKA IVORY JAMES KENNEDY AKA IVORY R KENNEDY

7/19/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO IVORY J KENNEDY AKA IVORY J KENNEDY SR AKA IVORY JAMES KENNEDY AKA IVORY R KENNEDY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO QUALITY DISCOUNT ROOFING LLC

7/19/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO QUALITY DISCOUNT ROOFING LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

7/19/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION A PUBLIC CORPORATION

7/19/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION A PUBLIC CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IDAIRA CINTRON ORTIZ AKA IDAIRA C ORTIZ

7/19/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO IDAIRA CINTRON ORTIZ AKA IDAIRA C ORTIZ

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

7/19/2022- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20368 PAGE 586-586

7/19/2022- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20368 PAGE 586-586

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2022; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 12/06/22 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/20/2022; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/06/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 PER COURT CALENDAR FROM 9/20/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING VIRTUAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 20, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/16/2022; ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2022; ANSWER CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO IVORY J KENNEDY AKA IVORY J KENNEDY SR AKA IVORY JAMES KENNEDY AKA IVORY R KENNEDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO QUALITY DISCOUNT ROOFING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION A PUBLIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO IDAIRA CINTRON ORTIZ AKA IDAIRA C ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20368 PAGE 586-586

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY DISCOUNT ROOFING, LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant