This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2022 at 02:20:03 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

1901 W Cypress Creek Road

Ft. Lauerdale, FL 33309

Defendants

DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY

Jacksonville, FL 32211

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

227 North Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY

Jacksonville, FL 32211

THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 North Tampa St., Suite 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPER

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patel, Pratik R

Po Box 771270

Coral Springs, FL 33077-1270

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/28/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLTF

8/2/2022- D28- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLTF

REPLY TO ANSWER PLTF

8/2/2022- D27- REPLY TO ANSWER PLTF

ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT -DEFT

8/1/2022- D26- ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT -DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FL HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION ON 7-15-22 @ 12:30 PM

7/29/2022- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FL HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION ON 7-15-22 @ 12:30 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (SUB) DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY ON 7-15-22 @ 12:20 PM

7/29/2022- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (SUB) DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY ON 7-15-22 @ 12:20 PM

MOTION TO APPROVE CM PLAN

7/28/2022- D23- MOTION TO APPROVE CM PLAN

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY ON 7-15-22 @ 12:20 PM

7/28/2022- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY ON 7-15-22 @ 12:20 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - CORPORATE SERVED ON THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT BY SERVING RENE EARHARDT AS LEGAL ASST. - ON - 7/20/22 @ 11:10AM

7/28/2022- D21- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - CORPORATE SERVED ON THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT BY SERVING RENE EARHARDT AS LEGAL ASST. - ON - 7/20/22 @ 11:10AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY N/K/A JAMES GRIFFIN -ON - 7/15/22 @ 1220PM

7/28/2022- D20- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY N/K/A JAMES GRIFFIN -ON - 7/15/22 @ 1220PM

NOTICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF STATUS & COMPLETION OF SERVICE

7/27/2022- D19- NOTICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF STATUS & COMPLETION OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

7/25/2022- D18- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

REPLY BY PLTF

7/25/2022- D17- REPLY BY PLTF

DISCLAIMER (CONDITIONAL) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

7/25/2022- D16- DISCLAIMER (CONDITIONAL) OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/31/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

6/30/2022- D14- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/31/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,096.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4183349

6/28/2022- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $1,096.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4183349

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL NOTE

6/28/2022- D11- NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

6/28/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; REPLY TO ANSWER PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/1/2022; ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/1/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FL HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION ON 7-15-22 @ 12:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/1/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (SUB) DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY ON 7-15-22 @ 12:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/29/2022; MOTION TO APPROVE CM PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/29/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY ON 7-15-22 @ 12:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/29/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - CORPORATE SERVED ON THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT BY SERVING RENE EARHARDT AS LEGAL ASST. - ON - 7/20/22 @ 11:10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/29/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY N/K/A JAMES GRIFFIN -ON - 7/15/22 @ 1220PM

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIANE ELISE MIA RAMSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DIANA ELISE MIA RAMSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20343 PAGE 2261-2262

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATEL, PRATIK