This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/28/2023 at 01:23:50 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS DARA J FOREST Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DARA J FOREST. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DARA J FOREST

GLEN EAGLE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF JACKSONVILLE, INC.

UNKNOW SPOUSE OF DARA J FOREST

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis, Corey Michael

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 07/25/2023 1100AM BOOK 20693 PAGE 493-495 RECORDED DOCUMENT

5/26/2023- D57- FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 07/25/2023 1100AM BOOK 20693 PAGE 493-495 RECORDED DOCUMENT

NOTICE OF SALE 07/25/2023 1100AM

5/26/2023- D56- NOTICE OF SALE 07/25/2023 1100AM

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 07/25/2023 1100AM BOOK 20693 PAGE 493-495

5/25/2023- D55- FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 07/25/2023 1100AM BOOK 20693 PAGE 493-495

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

5/24/2023- D53- NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE OF IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

4/20/2023- D52- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE OF IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

PRETRIAL STIPULATION (PLAINTIFF'S UNILATERAL)

4/20/2023- D51- PRETRIAL STIPULATION (PLAINTIFF'S UNILATERAL)

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - PLTF

4/2/2023- D50- MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - PLTF

NOTICE (PLTFS) OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

4/2/2023- D49- NOTICE (PLTFS) OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO NON-JURY TRIAL 5/25/23 @ 9:00 AM RM 510

3/22/2023- D48- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO NON-JURY TRIAL 5/25/23 @ 9:00 AM RM 510

REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS (PLAINTIFF'S)

3/21/2023- D47- REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF HEARING DATE SET FOR MAY 25, 2023 @ 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

3/21/2023- D46- NOTICE OF HEARING DATE SET FOR MAY 25, 2023 @ 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED (PLAINTIFF'S)

3/6/2023- D44- NOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF STATUS-PLAINTIFF'S

3/3/2023- D43- NOTICE OF STATUS-PLAINTIFF'S

EXHIBIT LIST (PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND)

2/11/2023- D42- EXHIBIT LIST (PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND)

PRETRIAL STATEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/11/2023- D41- PRETRIAL STATEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT TRIAL

2/11/2023- D40- MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT TRIAL

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/11/2023- D39- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE (PLAINTIFF'S) OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL

2/11/2023- D38- NOTICE (PLAINTIFF'S) OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2023; FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 07/25/2023 1100AM BOOK 20693 PAGE 493-495 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2023; NOTICE OF SALE 07/25/2023 1100AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Reschedule; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2023; FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 07/25/2023 1100AM BOOK 20693 PAGE 493-495

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2023; NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2023; FILED IN BOX # 211 (ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL MORTGAGE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2023; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE OF IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2023; PRETRIAL STIPULATION (PLAINTIFF'S UNILATERAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2023; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2023; NOTICE (PLTFS) OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARA J. FOREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED GLEN EAGLE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF JACKSONVILLE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED DARA J. FOREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20556 PAGE 1599-1600

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less