This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/31/2023 at 00:22:00 (UTC).

UNITED WHOLESALE MORTGAGE LLC VS CLAREESE STENZEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 UNITED WHOLESALE MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLAREESE STENZEL. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED WHOLESALE MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

PEYTON WEISGARBER

CLAREESE STENZEL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL

INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

Defendant Attorney

Belmudez, Sean Paul

Other Attorneys

Yang, Liu

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

3/2/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON OR BEFORE JUNE 2, 2023

5/18/2023- D37- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON OR BEFORE JUNE 2, 2023

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

5/12/2023- D36- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 1, AND UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 2

5/4/2023- D35- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 1, AND UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 2

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO SET FOR 6/30/23 @ 9:00 AM RM 510 REMARKS: NOT AT ISSUE.

5/3/2023- D34- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO SET FOR 6/30/23 @ 9:00 AM RM 510 REMARKS: NOT AT ISSUE.

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) TO SERVE A RESPONSE AND OR DIRECT MOTIONS TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

4/27/2023- D31- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) TO SERVE A RESPONSE AND OR DIRECT MOTIONS TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

4/26/2023- D32- NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LIU YANG FOR PEYTON WEISGARBER AND CLAREESE STENZEL

4/4/2023- D30- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LIU YANG FOR PEYTON WEISGARBER AND CLAREESE STENZEL

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A NON-JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

4/3/2023- D29- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A NON-JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

NOTICE OF FILING - PLTF

4/3/2023- D28- NOTICE OF FILING - PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEYTON WEISGARBER 03/14/2023

3/30/2023- D21- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEYTON WEISGARBER 03/14/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER 03/14/2023

3/30/2023- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER 03/14/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON INDEPENDANT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY DBA ISPC 03/10/2023

3/30/2023- D23- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON INDEPENDANT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY DBA ISPC 03/10/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 1 03/13/2023

3/30/2023- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 1 03/13/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 3/13/2023 1:30 PM

3/28/2023- D27- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 3/13/2023 1:30 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL 3/24/2023 11:46 AM

3/28/2023- D26- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL 3/24/2023 11:46 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CLAREESE STENZEL 3/24/2023 11:46 AM SUBSTITUTE BRIAN STENZEL AS FATHER

3/28/2023- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CLAREESE STENZEL 3/24/2023 11:46 AM SUBSTITUTE BRIAN STENZEL AS FATHER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SEAN BELMUDEZ FOR INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY , NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND NOTICE OF DESIGANTION OF SERVICE EMAIL PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

3/13/2023- D20- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SEAN BELMUDEZ FOR INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY , NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND NOTICE OF DESIGANTION OF SERVICE EMAIL PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2023; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON OR BEFORE JUNE 2, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2023; NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 1, AND UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2023; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO SET FOR 6/30/23 @ 9:00 AM RM 510 REMARKS: NOT AT ISSUE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2023; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/30/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 -PER COURT CALENDAR 5/2/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2023; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) TO SERVE A RESPONSE AND OR DIRECT MOTIONS TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/1/2023; NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LIU YANG FOR PEYTON WEISGARBER AND CLAREESE STENZEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY DBA ISPC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAREESE STENZEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEYTON WEISGARBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLAREESE STENZEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PEYTON WEISGARBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20599 PAGE 1551-1552

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less