This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/23/2023 at 01:04:06 (UTC).

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST VS ALFREDO GRACIA PINEDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALFREDO GRACIA PINEDA. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST

Defendants

SUREMA H REYES

ALFREDO GRACIA PINEDA

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dolan, Ian Christopher

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

3/6/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20651 PAGE 2206-2208 RECORDED DOCUMENT

4/20/2023- D25- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20651 PAGE 2206-2208 RECORDED DOCUMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER

4/20/2023- D22- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20651 PAGE 2206-2208

4/20/2023- D21- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20651 PAGE 2206-2208

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IAN DOLAN FOR U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

3/24/2023- D20- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IAN DOLAN FOR U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 ON 3/20/23

3/23/2023- D19- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 ON 3/20/23

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

3/23/2023- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ALFREDO GARCIA PINEDA ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

3/23/2023- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ALFREDO GARCIA PINEDA ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE SUREMA H. REYES A/K/A SUREMA HELENA PINEDA ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

3/23/2023- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE SUREMA H. REYES A/K/A SUREMA HELENA PINEDA ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20604 PAGE 668-669 RECORDED DOCUMENT

3/8/2023- D15- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20604 PAGE 668-669 RECORDED DOCUMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/09/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

3/7/2023- D12- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/09/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,086.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4348646

3/6/2023- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $1,086.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4348646

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

3/6/2023- D10- NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

3/6/2023- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

3/6/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS ISSUED ALFREDO GARCIA PINEDA

3/6/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ALFREDO GARCIA PINEDA

SUMMONS ISSUED SUREMA H. REYES A/K/A SUREMA HELENA PINEDA

3/6/2023- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED SUREMA H. REYES A/K/A SUREMA HELENA PINEDA

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

3/6/2023- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2023; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20651 PAGE 2206-2208 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2023; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2023; CANCELLED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/9/2023 9:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2023; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2023; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20651 PAGE 2206-2208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IAN DOLAN FOR U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR VRMTG ASSET TRUST AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 ON 3/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ALFREDO GARCIA PINEDA ON 3/20/23 @ 7:05 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED ALFREDO GARCIA PINEDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED SUREMA H. REYES A/K/A SUREMA HELENA PINEDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20604 PAGE 668-669

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less