This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/14/2022 at 01:20:32 (UTC).

TWYLA GAINEY NASH VS CRAIG ANDRA NASH

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 TWYLA GAINEY NASH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CRAIG ANDRA NASH. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TWYLA GAINEY NASH

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082

Respondent

CRAIG ANDRA NASH

Jacksonville, FL 32219

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Price, Lewis David

818 A1A N Ste 208

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-8217

Respondent Attorney

Strickland, Robert Anthony

66 W Flagler St Ste 900

Miami, FL 33130-1807

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leitman, Steven Alan

Po Box 51363

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32240-1363

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

2/8/2022- D10- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEWIS PRICE FOR TWYLA NASH

2/8/2022- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEWIS PRICE FOR TWYLA NASH

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4083295

2/8/2022- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4083295

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT STRICKLAND FOR CRAIG NASH

2/23/2022- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT STRICKLAND FOR CRAIG NASH

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4095030

2/25/2022- D23- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4095030

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

2/8/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /TWYLA GAINEY NASH

2/8/2022- D8- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /TWYLA GAINEY NASH

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /CRAIG ANDRA NASH

2/23/2022- D19- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /CRAIG ANDRA NASH

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /CRAIG ANDRA NASH

2/23/2022- D21- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /CRAIG ANDRA NASH

ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) ATY/FOR

2/23/2022- D22- ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) ATY/FOR

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / TWYLA NASH/ATTY

3/28/2022- D30- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / TWYLA NASH/ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; MOTION TO COMPEL (WIFE'S) DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS /TWYLA GAINEY NASH /LEWIS D. PRICE,ESQ., ATTY FOR WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (STEVEN LEITMAN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/11/2022 9:30 AM/STEVEN A LEITMAN-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MEDIATOR/STEVEN A LEITMAN-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; NOTICE OF ANSWERS ANSWERS TO STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES / TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / TWYLA NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE / TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; RESPONSE TO HUSBAND'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE / TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2022; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /CRAIG NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) DOCUMENTS TO CARIG ANDRA NASH FROM TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRAIG ANDRA NASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /TWYLA GAINEY NASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEWIS PRICE FOR TWYLA NASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /TWYLA GAINEY NASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/TWYLA GAINEY NASH/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leitman, Steven Alan