This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 20:00:55 (UTC).

TRINITY REST & RFG LLC AAO MCPO JEREMY SHELLENBERG VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 TRINITY REST RFG LLC AAO MCPO JEREMY SHELLENBERG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRINITY REST & RFG LLC AAO MCPO JEREMY SHELLENBERG

800 East Broward Blvd, Suite 510

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Tallahassee, FL 32399

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/11/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & JURY TRIAL

1/11/2023- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST TO DEFENDANT

1/11/2023- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S DUCE TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6) FOR 5-11-2023 @10AM@WEISSER,ELZAR & KANTOR

1/11/2023- D5- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S DUCE TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6) FOR 5-11-2023 @10AM@WEISSER,ELZAR & KANTOR

REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLAONTIFF TO DEFENDANT

1/11/2023- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLAONTIFF TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE

1/11/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312283

1/13/2023- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312283

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/19/2023- D9- NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2023; ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2023; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312283

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLAONTIFF TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S DUCE TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6) FOR 5-11-2023 @10AM@WEISSER,ELZAR & KANTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less