This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/22/2021 at 10:39:59 (UTC).

TOMEKA PONDEXTER VS BURLINGTON STORES, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 TOMEKA PONDEXTER filed an Other lawsuit against BURLINGTON STORES, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOMEKA PONDEXTER

Jacksonivlle, FL 32202

Defendants

BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

HUGO FIESCO

Jacksonville, FL 32258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Andrew Douglas

10 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3618

Defendant Attorney

Brown, J Bowen

407 N Howard Ave Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33606-1575

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

11/11/2021- D21- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION)

11/11/2021- D20- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS (DEFENDANT'S BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION) TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

11/11/2021- D19- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS (DEFENDANT'S BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION) TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS FIRST) TO PLTF TOMEKA PONDEXTER

10/28/2021- D18- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS FIRST) TO PLTF TOMEKA PONDEXTER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) FIRST/ TO PLTF TOMEKA PONDEXTER

10/28/2021- D17- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) FIRST/ TO PLTF TOMEKA PONDEXTER

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S AMENDED

10/12/2021- D16- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S AMENDED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL J BROWN FOR BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

10/12/2021- D15- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL J BROWN FOR BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE, CORP. (PLTF.)

9/30/2021- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE, CORP. (PLTF.)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE, CORP./PLTF.

9/30/2021- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE, CORP./PLTF.

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF.)

9/30/2021- D12- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF.)

AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL-FIRST

9/30/2021- D11- AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL-FIRST

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

9/21/2021- D10- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3984565

9/14/2021- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3984565

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., BURLINGTON STORES, INC. (PLTF)

9/13/2021- D8- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., BURLINGTON STORES, INC. (PLTF)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., BURLINGTON STORES, INC. - PLTF

9/13/2021- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., BURLINGTON STORES, INC. - PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT

9/13/2021- D6- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

9/13/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HUGO FIESCO

9/13/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO HUGO FIESCO

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/11/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/11/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/11/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS (DEFENDANT'S BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION) TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS FIRST) TO PLTF TOMEKA PONDEXTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) FIRST/ TO PLTF TOMEKA PONDEXTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL J BROWN FOR BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE, CORP. (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE, CORP./PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3984565

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., BURLINGTON STORES, INC. (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., BURLINGTON STORES, INC. - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO HUGO FIESCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN , J BOWEN