This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/25/2022 at 14:50:37 (UTC).

TIMOTHY MARK WILLIAMS, TRACY WILLIAMS Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 TIMOTHY MARK WILLIAMS, TRACY WILLIAMS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY, THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRACY WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Decedent

TIMOTHY MARK WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Martin, Joshua Kenneth

960185 Gateway Blvd Ste 201

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034-7843

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952977

7/30/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952977

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

7/30/2021- D2- PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

7/30/2021- D3- CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20002 PAGE 1290-1291

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: MARTIN, JOSHUA KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; PETITIONER: WILLIAMS, TRACY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PB/SUM ADMIN-ESTATE >=$1000 09/04/2018; Assessed : $346.00; Paid : $346.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952977

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; SUMMARY ADMIN-ESTATES VALUED AT $1,000 OR MORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less