This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/01/2022 at 19:41:30 (UTC).

THE DOCTORS CENTER, INC. A/A/O ANTOINETTE WALKER VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 THE DOCTORS CENTER, INC A/A/O ANTOINETTE WALKER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE DOCTORS CENTER, INC. A/A/O ANTOINETTE WALKER

76 South Laura Street Suite 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willis, L Darren

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

7/26/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -PLAINTIFF

7/26/2021- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -PLAINTIFF

ORDER SETTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

7/26/2021- D4- ORDER SETTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

COMPLAINT

7/26/2021- D5- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

7/26/2021- D6- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT-PLAINTIFF

7/26/2021- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT-PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

7/26/2021- D8- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

7/26/2021- D9- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3948227

7/27/2021- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3948227

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

7/27/2021- D12- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AUGUST 17, 2021 FOR DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPNAY, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO SALLY HALL

8/17/2021- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AUGUST 17, 2021 FOR DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPNAY, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO SALLY HALL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - PLAINTIFF

9/29/2021- D14- NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

11/12/2021- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2021; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AUGUST 17, 2021 FOR DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPNAY, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO SALLY HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 10/07/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3948227

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; ORDER SETTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Doctors Center Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willis, L Darren