This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/15/2022 at 22:03:59 (UTC).

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY VS FLORIDA PRO COATING INC

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA PRO COATING INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 145496

Cincinnati, OH 45250

Defendant

FLORIDA PRO COATING INC

Ruben Tinoco, Reg. Agent, 3732 Adirolf Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foeller, Scott Douglas

Attorney at Avrutis & Foeller PA

Po Box 4137

Sarasota, FL 34230-4137

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

7/18/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/18/2022- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR FORIDA PRO COATING INC.C/O RUBEN TINOCO , RE.AGENT

7/18/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR FORIDA PRO COATING INC.C/O RUBEN TINOCO , RE.AGENT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 07/26/22 @ 1:05PM TO FLORIDA PRO COATING INC., RUBEN TINOCO, RA, CORP. - PLTF.

7/29/2022- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 07/26/22 @ 1:05PM TO FLORIDA PRO COATING INC., RUBEN TINOCO, RA, CORP. - PLTF.

CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4195661

7/19/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4195661

MOTION TO DISMISS ( DEFENDANT'S ) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/15/2022- D7- MOTION TO DISMISS ( DEFENDANT'S ) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2022; MOTION TO DISMISS ( DEFENDANT'S ) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/1/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 07/26/22 @ 1:05PM TO FLORIDA PRO COATING INC., RUBEN TINOCO, RA, CORP. - PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$15,000 <= $30,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $400.00; Paid : $400.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4195661

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR FORIDA PRO COATING INC.C/O RUBEN TINOCO , RE.AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $15000 - $30000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foeller, Scott D