This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/26/2022 at 02:08:04 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS CYRIL J WARREN JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CYRIL J WARREN JR. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

6409 Congress Avenue #100, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

CYRIL J WARREN JR

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2853

Defendant Attorney

Brew, George Kellen

6817 Southpoint Pkwy Ste 1804

Jacksonville, FL 32216-6299

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/22/2022- D6- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/2022 @900AM VIA ZOOM

9/21/2022- D25- NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/2022 @900AM VIA ZOOM

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 11/30/22 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; DEFT COUNSEL DID NOT APPEAR

9/21/2022- D24- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 11/30/22 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; DEFT COUNSEL DID NOT APPEAR

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

9/2/2022- D18- NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR CYRIL J WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN ON 7/28/22 @ 12:30 PM

9/1/2022- D22- PROOF OF SERVICE FOR CYRIL J WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN ON 7/28/22 @ 12:30 PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GEORGE BREW FOR CYRIL WARREN JR

9/1/2022- D21- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GEORGE BREW FOR CYRIL WARREN JR

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR CYRIL J WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN

9/1/2022- D20- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR CYRIL J WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDICIAL OTHER

9/1/2022- D19- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDICIAL OTHER

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( PLAINTIFF'S ) DEFENDANT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYRIL J. WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN

8/31/2022- D17- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( PLAINTIFF'S ) DEFENDANT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYRIL J. WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GEORGE BREW FOR CYRIL WARREN JR

8/8/2022- D16- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GEORGE BREW FOR CYRIL WARREN JR

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN 07/28/2022 @ 12:30PM

8/2/2022- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN 07/28/2022 @ 12:30PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CTRIL J. WARREN JR ON 7-28-22 @ 12:30 PM

8/1/2022- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CTRIL J. WARREN JR ON 7-28-22 @ 12:30 PM

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - PLTF

7/27/2022- D13- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - PLTF

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/20/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

7/22/2022- D11- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/20/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,066.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4198599

7/22/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $1,066.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4198599

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN

7/22/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN

7/22/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN

CERTIFICATE

7/22/2022- D5- CERTIFICATE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/2022 @900AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2022; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 11/30/22 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; DEFT COUNSEL DID NOT APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/20/2022; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/30/2022 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 PER COURT CALENDAR FROM 9/20/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/6/2022; NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/6/2022; PROOF OF SERVICE FOR CYRIL J WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN ON 7/28/22 @ 12:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/6/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GEORGE BREW FOR CYRIL WARREN JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/6/2022; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR CYRIL J WARREN, JR. A/K/A CYRIL J. WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/6/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDICIAL OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; TRANSFER TO DIV. FC-C (CIRCUIT COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $1,066.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4198599

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CYRIL J WARREN JR AKA CYRIL J WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20371 PAGE 1505-1506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brew, George Kellen