This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/15/2023 at 02:04:02 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS, VS ADENIKE ADETAYO Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS, filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ADENIKE ADETAYO. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR CWABS,

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

Defendants

ADENIKE ADETAYO

Jacksonville, FL 32216

KAYODE ADETAYO

Jacksonville, FL 32216

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. (MIN

C/O: Ct Corporation, Registered Agent, 1200 S Pine Island Rd #250

Plantation, FL 33324

SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

C/O: L. Denise Wallace, Registered Agent, 920 3Rd Street, Suite B

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1

Jacksonville, FL 32216

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosaler, Brian Lee

Attorney at Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P A

1701 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-1572

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2 ON 3/6/23

3/8/2023- D23- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2 ON 3/6/23

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC 02/15/2023

2/28/2023- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC 02/15/2023

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4336845

2/21/2023- D21- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4336845

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION # 2

2/21/2023- D20- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION # 2

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1 ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

2/17/2023- D19- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1 ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ON 2/9/23 @ 11:55 AM

2/17/2023- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ON 2/9/23 @ 11:55 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE KAYODE ADETAYO ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

2/17/2023- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE KAYODE ADETAYO ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ADENIKE ADETAYO N/K/A ADENIKE MERCY RUFAL ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

2/17/2023- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ADENIKE ADETAYO N/K/A ADENIKE MERCY RUFAL ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/04/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

2/1/2023- D13- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/04/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20570 PAGE 376-376 RECORDED DOCUMENT

2/1/2023- D12- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20570 PAGE 376-376 RECORDED DOCUMENT

CASE FEES PAID: $1,101.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4324185

1/31/2023- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $1,101.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4324185

SUMMONS ISSUED SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

1/31/2023- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

1/31/2023- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION # 1

1/31/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION # 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAYODE ADETAYO

1/31/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAYODE ADETAYO

SUMMONS ISSUED ADENIKE ADETAYO NKA ADENIKE MERCY RUFAL

1/31/2023- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ADENIKE ADETAYO NKA ADENIKE MERCY RUFAL

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

1/31/2023- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20570 PAGE 376-376

1/31/2023- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20570 PAGE 376-376

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2 ON 3/6/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC 02/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4336845

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1 ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ON 2/9/23 @ 11:55 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE KAYODE ADETAYO ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ADENIKE ADETAYO N/K/A ADENIKE MERCY RUFAL ON 2/8/23 @ 5:28 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED SUMMER LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAYODE ADETAYO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED ADENIKE ADETAYO NKA ADENIKE MERCY RUFAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20570 PAGE 376-376

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less