This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/19/2023 at 02:01:23 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS ERICKA S BROWN

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERICKA S BROWN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SACKS, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SACKS, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

ERICKA S BROWN

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fornaro, Matthew

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 200

Coral Springs, FL 33076-3362

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/27/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/27/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ERICKA S BROWN -PLAINTIFF

1/27/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ERICKA S BROWN -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4321688

1/27/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4321688

SUMMONS ISSUED ERICKA S BROWN

1/28/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ERICKA S BROWN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/31/23 AT 11:40AM FOR ERICKA S BROWN, INDIVIDUAL

1/31/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/31/23 AT 11:40AM FOR ERICKA S BROWN, INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER AFFIDAVIT (DEFENDANT'S)

2/15/2023- D9- ANSWER AFFIDAVIT (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF FILING -DEFENDANT

2/16/2023- D10- NOTICE OF FILING -DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF ESTOPPEL, FRAUD AND IDENTITY THEFT -DEFENDANT

3/8/2023- D11- NOTICE OF ESTOPPEL, FRAUD AND IDENTITY THEFT -DEFENDANT

AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT BALANCE -PLAINTIFF

3/10/2023- D12- AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT BALANCE -PLAINTIFF

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL -REFERRED TO MEDIATION

3/16/2023- D13- PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL -REFERRED TO MEDIATION

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DENY

3/16/2023- D14- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DENY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DENY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2023; PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL -REFERRED TO MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2023; AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT BALANCE -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2023; NOTICE OF ESTOPPEL, FRAUD AND IDENTITY THEFT -DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; NOTICE OF FILING -DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/15/2023; ANSWER AFFIDAVIT (DEFENDANT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/31/23 AT 11:40AM FOR ERICKA S BROWN, INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED ERICKA S BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/16/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4321688

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ERICKA S BROWN -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less