This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/21/2023 at 15:06:59 (UTC).

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC. VS METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 SUNBELT RENTALS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC.

Defendant

METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ceriale, Matthew Agojo

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/21/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/21/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC

2/21/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338061

2/22/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338061

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338061

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less