This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/28/2021 at 09:24:12 (UTC).

STEPHEN VINING VS ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 STEPHEN VINING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN VINING

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Henry, Brian Patrick

5577 Broadcast Ct

Sarasota, FL 34240-8472

Bibb, David C

3191 Maguire Blvd Ste 160

Orlando, FL 32803-3723

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/13/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/13/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/13/2021- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/13/2021- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/13/2021- D6- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2021- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/17/2021- D9- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID BIBB FOR ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

11/17/2021- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID BIBB FOR ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRIAN HENRY FOR ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

11/17/2021- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRIAN HENRY FOR ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

11/17/2021- D12- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

11/17/2021- D13- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

RESPONSE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT FEDERAL DIVERSITY JURISDICTION REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2021- D14- RESPONSE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT FEDERAL DIVERSITY JURISDICTION REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2021- D15- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL BY PLTF

11/23/2021- D16- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL BY PLTF

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; RESPONSE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT FEDERAL DIVERSITY JURISDICTION REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRIAN HENRY FOR ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID BIBB FOR ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007518

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIBB

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry, Brian Patrick