This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/12/2022 at 05:21:04 (UTC).

STEAMBOAT MANAGEMENT LLC VS JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STEAMBOAT MANAGEMENT LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEAMBOAT MANAGEMENT LLC

7545 Centurion Parkway, Suite 303

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drach, Justin Seth

7545 Centurion Pkwy Ste 303

Jacksonville, FL 32256-4119

Defendant Attorney

Walker, Foye Buchannon

212 N Marion Ave

Lake City, FL 32055-3917

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS

4/20/2022- D25- ORDER DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS

MOTION TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS (AMENDED)

4/15/2022- D24- MOTION TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS (AMENDED)

MOTION TO DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS -PLTF

3/22/2022- D23- MOTION TO DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS -PLTF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3/3/2022- D22- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S FIRST SET/ TO PLTF

1/11/2022- D21- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S FIRST SET/ TO PLTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

1/11/2022- D20- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S FIRST)

1/11/2022- D19- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S FIRST)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1105-1105

1/4/2022- D18- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1105-1105

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1104-1104

1/4/2022- D17- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1104-1104

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1180-1180

1/4/2022- D16- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1180-1180

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

1/4/2022- D15- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II ONLY -PLTF

1/3/2022- D14- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II ONLY -PLTF

ANSWER DEFT

5/3/2021- D7- ANSWER DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOYE WALKER FOR JAMAR ARMSTRONG

11/12/2021- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOYE WALKER FOR JAMAR ARMSTRONG

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE -PLTF

11/9/2021- D12- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE -PLTF

NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

11/5/2021- D11- NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

ORDER DENYING PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/8/2021- D10- ORDER DENYING PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG ON 4/21/2021 @ 3:49 PM

4/22/2021- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG ON 4/21/2021 @ 3:49 PM

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2022; ORDER DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS BOOK 20251 PAGE 332-332

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2022; MOTION TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; MOTION TO DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S FIRST SET/ TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1105-1105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1104-1104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS DEFT TO PLTF BOOK 20102 PAGE 1180-1180

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; ANSWER DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/23/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG ON 4/21/2021 @ 3:49 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3858574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMAR LEROY ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drach, Justin Seth