This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 12/02/2021 at 12:55:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MAURICE BROCK

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAURICE BROCK. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2601 Blairstone Road

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Defendant

MAURICE BROCK

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Minacci, David Kenneth

140 W 1St St

Saint George Island, FL 32328-2752

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/3/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/3/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/3/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

9/29/2021- D5- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2021; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/3/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAURICE BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/3/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/3/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/3/2021; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Minacci