This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/13/2021 at 15:05:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION VS ALFRED W RUTLAND Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ALFRED W RUTLAND. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

1109 S. Marion Avenue

Lake City, FL 32025

Defendants

JOHN E RUTLAND

Jacksonville, FL 32222

ALFRED W RUTLAND

Jacksonville, FL 32256

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WILEY IKNER

Jacksonville, FL 32207

SHIRLEY IKNER

Jacksonville, FL 32207

JIM OVERTON

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perrone, Samuel Anthony

Office Of The General Counsel 1109 S Marion Ave Ms 2008

Lake City, FL 32025-5874

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

9/15/2021- D6- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DECLARATION OF TAKING -PETITIONER

9/15/2021- D5- DECLARATION OF TAKING -PETITIONER

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS E-SERVICE DESIGNATION (PETITIONERS)

9/15/2021- D4- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS E-SERVICE DESIGNATION (PETITIONERS)

COMPLAINT/PETITION

9/15/2021- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION

COVER SHEET

9/15/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/ADDL DEFENDANT FEE @$2.50ea; Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19925 PAGE 2307-2309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; DECLARATION OF TAKING -PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS E-SERVICE DESIGNATION (PETITIONERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant