This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 07:53:19 (UTC).

SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O MARCUS PEGRAM VS FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O MARCUS PEGRAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O MARCUS PEGRAM

1619 Nw 136Th Ave, Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

Defendant Attorney

Xayasone, Soutchay

4511 N Himes Ave Ste 140

Tampa, FL 33614-7005

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/24/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/24/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. -PLAINTIFF

6/24/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3923445

6/25/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3923445

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

6/25/2021- D7- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON JULY 29, 2021 FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO SARANNAH MCMURTRY

8/7/2021- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON JULY 29, 2021 FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO SARANNAH MCMURTRY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SOUTCHAY XAYASONE FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

8/12/2021- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SOUTCHAY XAYASONE FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

STIPULATION (JOINT) AND PROPOSED AGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

8/12/2021- D10- STIPULATION (JOINT) AND PROPOSED AGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

8/13/2021- D12- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

8/16/2021- D11- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 07/29/2021 FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INS CO

8/26/2021- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 07/29/2021 FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INS CO

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

9/14/2021- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

9/14/2021- D15- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) /PLAINTIFF'S

10/15/2021- D16- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) /PLAINTIFF'S

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

10/15/2021- D17- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

12/22/2021- D18- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

12/22/2021- D19- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2021; PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) /PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/15/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/15/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 07/29/2021 FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/8/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON JULY 29, 2021 FOR FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO SARANNAH MCMURTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS<$100 3/1/2012; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 08/12/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3923445

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O MARCUS PEGRAM is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOUTCHAY XAYASONE