This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 21:10:19 (UTC).

SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O GIOVANA CASTRO VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O GIOVANA CASTRO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O GIOVANA CASTRO

1619 Nw 136Th Ave, Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

Defendant Attorney

Lovelady, Hillary Hannah

76 S Laura St Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5403

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

3/11/2022- D27- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -PLAINTIFF

3/11/2022- D26- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -PLAINTIFF

ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

3/4/2022- D25- ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

2/2/2022- D24- NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

2/2/2022- D23- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

2/2/2022- D22- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

2/2/2022- D21- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

2/2/2022- D20- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT'S)

1/31/2022- D19- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT'S)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, BY HILLARY H. LOVELADY, ATTY., FOR DEFENDANT

1/31/2022- D18- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, BY HILLARY H. LOVELADY, ATTY., FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 627.736(10), FLA. STAT. (DEFENDANT'S)

1/31/2022- D17- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 627.736(10), FLA. STAT. (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

1/31/2022- D16- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND AGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE

1/14/2022- D15- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND AGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BOTH PARTIES

1/6/2022- D12- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BOTH PARTIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 10/19/21 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO LYNETTE COLEMAN

12/14/2021- D11- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 10/19/21 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO LYNETTE COLEMAN

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANACIAL OFFICER ON 10/19/2021 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO

11/13/2021- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANACIAL OFFICER ON 10/19/2021 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HILLARY LOVELADY FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE ADDRESS (KD_PIPJAX@KUBICKIDRAPER.COM)

10/26/2021- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HILLARY LOVELADY FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE ADDRESS (KD_PIPJAX@KUBICKIDRAPER.COM)

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (DEFENDANT'S)

10/26/2021- D8- MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (DEFENDANT'S)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2022; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2021; MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/03/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4000736

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPINAL INJURY CENTERS A/A/O MARCUS PEGRAM is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lovelady, Hillary Hannah