This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 19:17:13 (UTC).

SOUTH MANDARIN CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O LAUREN M JABLONSKI VS NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 SOUTH MANDARIN CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O LAUREN M JABLONSKI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH MANDARIN CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O LAUREN M JABLONSKI

St Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

1201 Hays Street C/O Csc

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATIONALWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

8/26/2021- D10- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATIONALWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3972036

8/25/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3972036

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO NATIONALWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

8/24/2021- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO NATIONALWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

8/24/2021- D6- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2021- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2021- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

8/24/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

8/24/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATIONALWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 12/16/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3972036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO NATIONALWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III