This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 02:13:28 (UTC).

SHERONNA PATRICE HALL VS GREGORY LEROY HALL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 SHERONNA PATRICE HALL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GREGORY LEROY HALL. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALEY, RUSSELL L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALEY, RUSSELL L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHERONNA PATRICE HALL

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Respondent

GREGORY LEROY HALL

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Not Classified By Court

Mediator Appointed

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Drake, Brenda A

4600 Touchton Rd E Bldg 100 Ste 150

Jacksonville, FL 32246-8299

Respondent Attorney

Benjamin, Iana Del

1 Independent Dr Ste 2200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5050

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leitman, Steven Alan

Po Box 51363

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32240-1363

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 20329 PAGE 50-57

6/15/2022- D37- FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 20329 PAGE 50-57

NOTICE OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/GREGORY LEROY HALL/ATTY

3/25/2022- D23- NOTICE OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/GREGORY LEROY HALL/ATTY

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /GREGORY LEROY HALL

3/25/2022- D24- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /GREGORY LEROY HALL

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/SHERONNA PATRICE HALL/ATTY

3/3/2022- D20- NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/SHERONNA PATRICE HALL/ATTY

ANSWER TO HUSBAND'S COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF / SHERONNA PATRICE HALL/ATTY

3/3/2022- D19- ANSWER TO HUSBAND'S COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF / SHERONNA PATRICE HALL/ATTY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

3/2/2022- D18- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

ANSWER (HUSBAND'S VERIFIED) TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN AND HUSBAND'S VERIFIED COUNTERPETITON FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

3/2/2022- D14- ANSWER (HUSBAND'S VERIFIED) TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN AND HUSBAND'S VERIFIED COUNTERPETITON FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER (RESPONDENT'S HUSBAND'S)

3/2/2022- D16- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER (RESPONDENT'S HUSBAND'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IANA BENJAMIN FOR GREGORY HALL

3/2/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IANA BENJAMIN FOR GREGORY HALL

SUMMONS ISSUED -GREGORY HALL

2/1/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED -GREGORY HALL

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/1/2022- D9- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS /ATTY FOR WIFE

2/1/2022- D5- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS /ATTY FOR WIFE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

2/1/2022- D7- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

COVER SHEET

2/1/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -SHERONNA HALL

2/1/2022- D8- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -SHERONNA HALL

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN/SHERONNA PATRICIA BROOWN/ATTY

2/1/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN/SHERONNA PATRICIA BROOWN/ATTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRENDA DRAKE FOR SHERONNA HALL

2/1/2022- D4- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRENDA DRAKE FOR SHERONNA HALL

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

2/1/2022- D6- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: BENJAMIN, IANA DEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: DRAKE, BRENDA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 20329 PAGE 50-57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ORDER GRANTING NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; PROOF OF RESIDENCY - SHERONNA PATRICE HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2022; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AGREEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 06/14/2022 9:40 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST)/SHERONNA PATRICE HALL/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (HUSB'S FIRST), TO SHERONNA PATRICE HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -GREGORY HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -SHERONNA HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS /ATTY FOR WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRENDA DRAKE FOR SHERONNA HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN/SHERONNA PATRICIA BROOWN/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leitman, Steven Alan