This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/18/2022 at 15:50:02 (UTC).

SHELLY HARRIS VS CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 SHELLY HARRIS filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELLY HARRIS

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA

117 W. Duval Street, 4Th Floor

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shanteau, Douglas William

10 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3618

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

8/31/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/31/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

8/31/2021- D4- NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

8/31/2021- D5- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT

8/31/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FLORIDA

8/31/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FLORIDA

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3975701

8/31/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3975701

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S)

11/29/2021- D10- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S FIRST)

11/29/2021- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S FIRST)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S) FIRST SET OF/ TO PLTF

11/29/2021- D12- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S) FIRST SET OF/ TO PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT) TO PLTF FIRST/

12/10/2021- D13- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT) TO PLTF FIRST/

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) TO PLTF/

12/10/2021- D14- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) TO PLTF/

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) AND MOTION TO STRIKE FABRE DEFENSE

12/17/2021- D15- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) AND MOTION TO STRIKE FABRE DEFENSE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/18/2021; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) AND MOTION TO STRIKE FABRE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT) TO PLTF/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT) TO PLTF FIRST/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S) FIRST SET OF/ TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3975701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanteau, Douglas William