This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/26/2022 at 06:15:27 (UTC).

SHEILA ANN JENKINS VS ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 SHEILA ANN JENKINS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY, LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEILA ANN JENKINS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Defendants

PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES, LLC

5870 North Hiatus Road, Suite 200

Tamarac, FL 33321

OPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE, LLC

3024 Business Park Circle

Goodlettsville, TN 37072

ST. VINCENTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

1 Shircliff Way

Jacksonville, FL 32204

DRS. MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, P.A.

3599 University Blvd., South, Bldg 300

Jacksonville, FL 32216

ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY, LLC

531 S 6Th St Suite 2

Macclenny, FL 32063

ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

One Park Plaza

Nashville, TN 37203

NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A.

4085 University Blvd S Suite 3

Jacksonville, FL 32216

ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER C/O PARALLON

Po Box 292609

Nashville, TN 37229

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagan, John Schuyler

1063 Park Ave

Orange Park, FL 32073-4121

Defendant Attorneys

Fialkoff, Kassia

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3400

Miami, FL 33131-4325

Snider, Tracy Jerrel

1005 Morning Dove Ct

Statesboro, GA 30461-4415

Hansen, Ashley-Britt

Suite 15, #510, 4530 Saint Johns Ave

Jacksonville, FL 32210-1852

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20459 PAGE 1649-1651

10/6/2022- D34- FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20459 PAGE 1649-1651

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND I BOOTH III, ESQ.

10/4/2022- D33- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND I BOOTH III, ESQ.

AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND I BOOTH III, ESQ.

10/4/2022- D32- AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND I BOOTH III, ESQ.

NOTICE OF HEARING 10/06/2022 3:40 PM IN ROOM 703

7/29/2022- D31- NOTICE OF HEARING 10/06/2022 3:40 PM IN ROOM 703

CONSENT (DEFT NEUROLOGY PARTNERS P.A.'S) TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

7/13/2022- D30- CONSENT (DEFT NEUROLOGY PARTNERS P.A.'S) TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST ON PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC, PPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE LLC, ST VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC, ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY LLC

7/8/2022- D29- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST ON PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC, PPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE LLC, ST VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC, ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC, PPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE LLC, ST VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC, ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY LLC

7/7/2022- D28- MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC, PPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE LLC, ST VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC, ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY LLC

CONSENT (DEFT MORI BEAN & BROOKS) TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

7/7/2022- D27- CONSENT (DEFT MORI BEAN & BROOKS) TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER OF DEFT MORI, BEAN AND BROOKS, INC

4/12/2022- D26- ANSWER OF DEFT MORI, BEAN AND BROOKS, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

9/23/2021- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES, LLC

9/23/2021- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO OPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE, LLC

9/23/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO OPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

9/23/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A.

9/23/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DRS/ MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, P.A.

9/23/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DRS/ MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, P.A.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY, LLC.

9/23/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY, LLC.

COMPLAINT

9/23/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

9/23/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/10/2022; FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20459 PAGE 1649-1651

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2022; NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND I BOOTH III, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2022; AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND I BOOTH III, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING 10/06/2022 3:40 PM IN ROOM 703

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2022; CONSENT (DEFT NEUROLOGY PARTNERS P.A.'S) TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST ON PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC, PPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE LLC, ST VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC, ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC, PPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE LLC, ST VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC, ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; CONSENT (DEFT MORI BEAN & BROOKS) TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; ANSWER OF DEFT MORI, BEAN AND BROOKS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KASSIA FIALKOFF FOR DRS. MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO OPTIMAL JACKSONVILLE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DRS/ MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ACCESS PHYSICAL THERAPY, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2021; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRS. MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange Park Medical Center, Inc. Dba Orange Park Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A. D/B/A EMAS SPINE & BRAIN SPECIALISTS A/A/O NATASHA ATKINSON is a litigant