This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 17:22:49 (UTC).

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC VS LORENZO HAWKINS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LORENZO HAWKINS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC

Defendant

LORENZO HAWKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/29/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/29/2022- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. LORENZO HAKINS

11/29/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. LORENZO HAKINS

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. LORENZO HAWKINS

11/29/2022- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. LORENZO HAWKINS

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4287452

12/1/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4287452

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST LORENZO HAWKINS

12/16/2022- D7- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST LORENZO HAWKINS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (PLTF'S) DEFAULT

12/16/2022- D8- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (PLTF'S) DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO LORENZO HAWKINS ON 12-06 @640PM INDIVIDUAL

12/16/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO LORENZO HAWKINS ON 12-06 @640PM INDIVIDUAL

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/16/2022- D10- VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST LORENZO HAWKINS

12/21/2022- D11- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST LORENZO HAWKINS

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BOOK 20547 PAGE 1444-1444

1/4/2023- D12- FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BOOK 20547 PAGE 1444-1444

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

1/10/2023- D13- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312699

1/14/2023- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312699

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2023
  • FinancialDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed: $7.00; Paid: $7.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312699

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2023; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/7/2023; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BOOK 20547 PAGE 1444-1444

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO LORENZO HAWKINS ON 12-06 @640PM INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (PLTF'S) DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4287452

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. LORENZO HAKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less