This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 16:41:42 (UTC).

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC VS LORENZO HAWKINS

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LORENZO HAWKINS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SACKS, JONATHAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SACKS, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC

Defendant

LORENZO HAWKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/20/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/20/2022- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LORENZO HAWKINS

9/20/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LORENZO HAWKINS

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO LORENZO HAWKINS

9/20/2022- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO LORENZO HAWKINS

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4243745

9/22/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4243745

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S) -AS TO LORENZO HAWKINS

10/20/2022- D7- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S) -AS TO LORENZO HAWKINS

ANSWER FILED BY LORENZO HAWKINS

10/25/2022- D8- ANSWER FILED BY LORENZO HAWKINS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/25/2022; ANSWER FILED BY LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/24/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S) -AS TO LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4243745

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LORENZO HAWKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less