This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/20/2023 at 19:19:48 (UTC).

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC VS BRITTANY AUSTIN

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRITTANY AUSTIN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC

Defendant

BRITTANY AUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET - BRITTANY AUSTIN

1/23/2023- D2- COVER SHEET - BRITTANY AUSTIN

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

1/23/2023- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED - BRITTANY AUSTIN

1/23/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED - BRITTANY AUSTIN

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS - BRITTANY AUSTIN

1/23/2023- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS - BRITTANY AUSTIN

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318395

1/24/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318395

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/5/2023- D7- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2023; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318395

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS - BRITTANY AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED - BRITTANY AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less