This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 17:23:23 (UTC).

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC VS BRITTANY AUSTIN

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRITTANY AUSTIN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER, LLC

Defendant

BRITTANY AUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/29/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/29/2022- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

11/29/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

11/29/2022- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4287423

12/1/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4287423

ANSWER DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

12/13/2022- D7- ANSWER DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY - PLAINTIFF

12/21/2022- D8- MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY - PLAINTIFF

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

12/21/2022- D9- VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 12/08/22 @ 7:32PM TO BRITTANY AUSTIN, INDIVIDUAL - PLAINTIFF

12/21/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 12/08/22 @ 7:32PM TO BRITTANY AUSTIN, INDIVIDUAL - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT PAID

1/3/2023- D11- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT PAID

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2023; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 12/08/22 @ 7:32PM TO BRITTANY AUSTIN, INDIVIDUAL - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2022; ANSWER DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed: $185.00; Paid: $185.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed: $3.50; Paid: $3.50; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4287423

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. BRITTANY AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less