This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 12:03:14 (UTC).

SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1 LLC VS SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2022 SFR INVESTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BORROWER 1 LLC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1 LLC

Po Box 4300

Scottsdale, AZ 85261

Defendant

SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cruikshank, Elizabeth Marie

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328-4011

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245786

9/23/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245786

COVER SHEET

9/25/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

9/25/2022- D3- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2022- D4- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

9/25/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/11/22 @ 6:13PM TO SHANEL VAN PUTTEN, INDIVIDUAL - PLAINTIFF

10/13/2022- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/11/22 @ 6:13PM TO SHANEL VAN PUTTEN, INDIVIDUAL - PLAINTIFF

ANSWER DEFT. SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

10/17/2022- D8- ANSWER DEFT. SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

MEMORANDUM TO DEPOSIT $2,760.00 PAST DUE RENT NO LATER THAN 4PM TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 01, 2022

10/26/2022- D9- MEMORANDUM TO DEPOSIT $2,760.00 PAST DUE RENT NO LATER THAN 4PM TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 01, 2022

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -PLAINTIFF

11/3/2022- D10- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT GINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION -PLAINTIFF

11/4/2022- D11- MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT GINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION -PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/7/2022; MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT GINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2022; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/31/2022; MEMORANDUM TO DEPOSIT $2,760.00 PAST DUE RENT NO LATER THAN 4PM TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 01, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; ANSWER DEFT. SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/11/22 @ 6:13PM TO SHANEL VAN PUTTEN, INDIVIDUAL - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO SHANTEL VAN PUTTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245786

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK