This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/16/2023 at 23:07:35 (UTC).

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC VS DENISE M TOWNSEND Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DENISE M TOWNSEND. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC

Defendants

JEREMIAH D TOWNSEND

DENISE M TOWNSEND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/23/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/23/2023- D3- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

2/23/2023- D4- CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMIAH D. TOWNSEND

2/23/2023- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMIAH D. TOWNSEND

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENISE M. TOWNSEND

2/23/2023- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENISE M. TOWNSEND

CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338951

2/23/2023- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338951

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 03/30/23 TO JEREMIAH D. TOWNSEND - PLAINTIFF

3/30/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 03/30/23 TO JEREMIAH D. TOWNSEND - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/08/23 @ 12:10PM TO DENISE M. TOWNSEND, SUBSTITUTE, HESTER HUMMER, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF

3/30/2023- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/08/23 @ 12:10PM TO DENISE M. TOWNSEND, SUBSTITUTE, HESTER HUMMER, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DENISE M TOWNSEND

4/11/2023- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DENISE M TOWNSEND

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEFT

4/11/2023- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEFT

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DENISE M TOWNSEND

4/13/2023- D12- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DENISE M TOWNSEND

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST DENISE M TOWNSEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2023; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DENISE M TOWNSEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/08/23 @ 12:10PM TO DENISE M. TOWNSEND, SUBSTITUTE, HESTER HUMMER, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 03/30/23 TO JEREMIAH D. TOWNSEND - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4338951

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENISE M. TOWNSEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMIAH D. TOWNSEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less