Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/06/2021 at 10:04:37 (UTC).

SEBASTIAN WOJCIK VS MICHELLE DENISE HUFFMAN

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 SEBASTIAN WOJCIK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHELLE DENISE HUFFMAN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GUY, JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GUY, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEBASTIAN WOJCIK

Jacksonville, FL 32226

Respondent

MICHELLE DENISE HUFFMAN

Orange Park, FL 32073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Parker, Karen B

Datran I Suite 514 9100 S Dadeland Blvd

Miami, FL 33156-7814

Perez, Leanne

4600 Touchton Rd E Ste 150

Jacksonville, FL 32246-8299

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860208

4/15/2021- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860208

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D11- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEANNE PEREZ FOR SEBASTIAN WOJCIK

4/15/2021- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEANNE PEREZ FOR SEBASTIAN WOJCIK

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/21/2021; CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2021; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: PARKER, KAREN B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2021; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 19734 PAGE 1469-1489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; CFID-CERTIFICATE /MICHELLE HUFFMAN WOJCIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; CFID-CERTIFICATE - MICHELLE HUFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; CFID-CERTIFICATE - SEBASTIAN WOJCIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/3/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE 5/18/21 AT 4:40PM, VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - MICHELLE HUFFAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; ANSWER TO HUSBAND'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND WAIVER OF PROCESS AND 20 -DAY STATUTORY PERIOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEANNE PEREZ FOR SEBASTIAN WOJCIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -SEBASTIAN WOJCIK /ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING -SEBASTIAN WOJCIK /ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT -SEBASTIAN WOJCIK /ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less