This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/22/2022 at 15:58:48 (UTC).

SANDRA APPLEBY VS CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 SANDRA APPLEBY filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF JACKSONVILLE. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDRA APPLEBY

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

117 West Duval Street, Suite 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rosenbloom, Leigh Farnell

Office Of General Counsel, 117 W Duval St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5721

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Wirtz, Gregg L

329 Royal Tern Rd S

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-6208

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

5/27/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3900673

5/28/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3900673

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CITY OF JACKSONVILLE C/O OFFICE OF FENERAL COUNSEL ON 06/07/2021 @235PM BY HEATHER DUGAN

6/9/2021- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CITY OF JACKSONVILLE C/O OFFICE OF FENERAL COUNSEL ON 06/07/2021 @235PM BY HEATHER DUGAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

5/27/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

5/27/2021- D5- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEIGH ROSENBLOOM FOR CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

7/6/2021- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LEIGH ROSENBLOOM FOR CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S)

7/6/2021- D12- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S) FIRST/TO PLAINTIFF, SANDRA APPLEBY

7/6/2021- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S) FIRST/TO PLAINTIFF, SANDRA APPLEBY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

7/6/2021- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

7/7/2021- D15- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/18/2021 @130PM VIA ZOOM

8/16/2021- D16- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/18/2021 @130PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S)

8/30/2021- D17- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

8/30/2021- D18- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) OF PLAINTIFF'S

8/30/2021- D19- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) OF PLAINTIFF'S

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (SECOND) REFERRED TO GREGG L. WIRTZ ESQ. FOR (RESCHEDULED TO) JANUARY 07, 2022 @ 09:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM (4 HOURS)

10/12/2021- D20- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (SECOND) REFERRED TO GREGG L. WIRTZ ESQ. FOR (RESCHEDULED TO) JANUARY 07, 2022 @ 09:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM (4 HOURS)

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDITION ON 1/7/22

12/20/2021- D21- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDITION ON 1/7/22

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

1/25/2022- D22- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDITION ON 1/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (SECOND) REFERRED TO GREGG L. WIRTZ ESQ. FOR (RESCHEDULED TO) JANUARY 07, 2022 @ 09:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM (4 HOURS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) OF PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/16/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/18/2021 @130PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2021; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (CITY OF JACKSONVILLE'S) FIRST/TO PLAINTIFF, SANDRA APPLEBY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3900673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF JACKSONVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/28/2021; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases where City Of Jacksonville A Municipal Corporation Of The State Of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wirtz, Gregg L