This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 00:23:50 (UTC).

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY VS KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY

9900 West Sample Road, Suite 201

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Defendant

KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Udine, Michael Ira

9900 W Sample Rd Ste 201

Coral Springs, FL 33065-4009

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/1/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/1/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

12/1/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4041034

12/1/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4041034

SUMMONS ISSUED KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

12/1/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/14/2021 NOT FOUND, KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

12/29/2021- D8- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/14/2021 NOT FOUND, KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4059215

1/2/2022- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4059215

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON - PLAINTIFF

1/3/2022- D11- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

1/3/2022- D15- SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/17/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; > CANCEL REASON - PLAINTIFF UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 2/17/2022 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4059215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/29/2021; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/14/2021 NOT FOUND, KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/17/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4041034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED KIMLANDA LYNETTE MCCRIMMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Udine, Michael I, ESQ.