This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2023 at 08:05:57 (UTC).

ROSELINE MORENCY VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 ROSELINE MORENCY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSELINE MORENCY

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

SUZANNE HOWARD

Jacksonville, FL 32210

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY

One Geico Center

Macon, GA 31295-0001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evans, Anthony Wayne

1948 N John Young Pkwy

Kissimmee, FL 34741-3221

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/30/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/30/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY

1/30/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUZANNE SLATER HOWARD

1/30/2023- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUZANNE SLATER HOWARD

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322719

1/30/2023- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322719

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322719

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUZANNE SLATER HOWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less