This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/13/2023 at 03:15:10 (UTC).

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC VS HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCI Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCI. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC

2424 North Federal Highway Suite 360

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendants

RICHARD JAMES SARKEES

Jacksonville, FL 32256

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES

Jacksonville, FL 32256

HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCI

Ponte Vedra, FL 32082

STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

110 Solana Road Suite 102

Ponte Vedra, FL 32082

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

Jacksonville, FL 32256

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

2424 N Federal Hwy Ste 360

Boca Raton, FL 33431-7780

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

3/7/2023- D35- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5/5 @ 9 AM IN ROOM 510 REMARKS: DEFT APPLYING FOR ASST. FUND

3/2/2023- D34- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5/5 @ 9 AM IN ROOM 510 REMARKS: DEFT APPLYING FOR ASST. FUND

NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER FOR 02/28/2023

2/21/2023- D32- NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER FOR 02/28/2023

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES-PLAINTIFF'S

2/9/2023- D31- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES-PLAINTIFF'S

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST RICHARD JAMES SARKEES, HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC, STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC, ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION NKA STEPHANIE LEDFORD OTHER

2/10/2023- D29- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST RICHARD JAMES SARKEES, HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC, STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC, ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION NKA STEPHANIE LEDFORD OTHER

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST RICHARD JAMES SARKEES, HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC, STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC, ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION NKA STEPHANIE LEDFORD

2/10/2023- D30- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST RICHARD JAMES SARKEES, HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC, STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC, ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION NKA STEPHANIE LEDFORD

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 N/K/A STEPHANIE LEDFORD

2/9/2023- D28- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 N/K/A STEPHANIE LEDFORD

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

2/9/2023- D27- NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A NON-JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

1/20/2023- D20- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A NON-JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE

NOTICE OF FILING ORDER SETTING CMC

1/20/2023- D19- NOTICE OF FILING ORDER SETTING CMC

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES ON 1-2-23 @ 11:25 AM

1/20/2023- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES ON 1-2-23 @ 11:25 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RICHARD JAMES SARKEES ON 01/02/2023 @1125AM BY STEPHANIE LEDFORD

1/19/2023- D26- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RICHARD JAMES SARKEES ON 01/02/2023 @1125AM BY STEPHANIE LEDFORD

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC ON 12/30/2022 @1139AM

1/19/2023- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC ON 12/30/2022 @1139AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC ON 12/30/2022 @1139AM BY CHASE MILLS

1/19/2023- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC ON 12/30/2022 @1139AM BY CHASE MILLS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC ON 12/28/2022 @100PM BY DONNA MOCH

1/19/2023- D23- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC ON 12/28/2022 @100PM BY DONNA MOCH

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 ON 01/02/2023 @1125AM

1/19/2023- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 ON 01/02/2023 @1125AM

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 ON 01/02/2023 @1125AM

1/19/2023- D21- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 ON 01/02/2023 @1125AM

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/28/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

12/27/2022- D16- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/28/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Reschedule; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5/5 @ 9 AM IN ROOM 510 REMARKS: DEFT APPLYING FOR ASST. FUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 05/05/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 -PER COURT CALENDAR 2/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2023; NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER FOR 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST RICHARD JAMES SARKEES, HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC, STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC, ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION NKA STEPHANIE LEDFORD OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST AGAINST RICHARD JAMES SARKEES, HORIZONS AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC, STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC, ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION NKA STEPHANIE LEDFORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2023; NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES-PLAINTIFF'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2023; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 N/K/A STEPHANIE LEDFORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED HORIZON AT STONEBRIDGE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION II INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD JAMES SARKEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED RICHARD JAMES SARKEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20535 PAGE 2323-2324

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/27/2022; NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less