This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/02/2022 at 11:24:51 (UTC).

ROBERTO GALLEGOS VS GLORIA GALLEGOS

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 ROBERTO GALLEGOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GLORIA GALLEGOS. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALEY, RUSSELL L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALEY, RUSSELL L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERTO GALLEGOS

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Respondent

GLORIA GALLEGOS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Irving, Aaron James

1934 Retaw St

Jacksonville, FL 32210-3134

Respondent Attorney

Bulger, Dustin Patrick

2120 Corporate Square Blvd Ste 17

Jacksonville, FL 32216-1976

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Mason, J Demere II

90 Fort Wade Rd Ste 100

Ponte Vedra, FL 32081-5114

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

5/16/2022- D4- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AARON IRVING FOR ROBERTO GALLEGOS

5/16/2022- D6- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AARON IRVING FOR ROBERTO GALLEGOS

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4153072

5/16/2022- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4153072

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

5/17/2022- D8- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR ANNULMENT OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN/ROBERTO GALLEGOS/ATTY.

5/16/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR ANNULMENT OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN/ROBERTO GALLEGOS/ATTY.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DUSTIN BULGER FOR GLORIA GALLEGOS

5/23/2022- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DUSTIN BULGER FOR GLORIA GALLEGOS

CFID - CERTIFICATE PETITIONER

8/4/2022- D21- CFID - CERTIFICATE PETITIONER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2022; NOTICE OF FILING -RESPONDENT'S PARENTING COURSE CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/12/2022; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -AGREEMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 09/29/2022 9:40 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/16/2022; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION -J DEMERE MASON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /GLORIA J GALLEGOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2022; NOTICE OF PROVIDING SUPPLEMETNAL DISCLSOURES/ROBERTO GALLEGOS/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2022; CFID - CERTIFICATE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/19/2022; NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE - GLORIDA GALLEGOS / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; NOTICE OF PROVIDING DISCLOSURES/ROBERT GALLEGOS/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/23/2022 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM/J DEMERE MASON JR.-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -LINKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -GLORIA GALLEGOS, F/K/A GLORIA INEZ RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4153072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AARON IRVING FOR ROBERTO GALLEGOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR ANNULMENT OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN/ROBERTO GALLEGOS/ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, J Demere II