This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/28/2021 at 22:29:23 (UTC).

ROBERT J. WAGNER JR VS BRITTANY R. WAGNER

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ROBERT J WAGNER JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRITTANY R WAGNER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, LANCE M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, LANCE M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT J. WAGNER JR

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Respondent

BRITTANY R. WAGNER

Hilliard, FL 32046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Treece, Thomas D

4316 Kincardine Dr

Jacksonville, FL 32257-5081

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL THOMAS TREECE FOR ROBERT WAGNER JR

10/13/2021- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL THOMAS TREECE FOR ROBERT WAGNER JR

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

10/13/2021- D6- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007583

10/13/2021- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007583

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4029090

11/9/2021- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4029090

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; CORRESPONDENCE - TO COLLIE AMBER, FROM LORETTA RHODEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2021; ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER (SPECIAL) SPECIAL PORCESS SERVER, INC, KATHLEEN E. CONRAN, SANDY NORDIN, ROGER MARTUCCI AND BRUCE TUSHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER : CONRAN INVESTIGATIONS & SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER, INC., EMPLOYEES KATHLEEN E. CONRAN, SANDY NORDIN, ROGER MARTUCCI & BRUCE TUSHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2021; MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER (CONRAN INVESTIGATIONS & SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER, INC.) / ROBERT J. WAGNER, JR/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4029090

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED -BRITTANY RAE WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4007583

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL THOMAS TREECE FOR ROBERT WAGNER JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/ROBERT WAGNER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Treece, Thomas D